Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Zogg, Erik, against Gray, Kornelia, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with DENKIN, DAVID LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDENKIN, DAVID LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 To $8,000 (South County) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)
Date: June 09, 2021JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022066006)
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: March 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022066006) | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - OF DEFAULT | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OF BREACH OF STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT - DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.