Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Singer, Shayna, against Herschberger, Terry A, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims Between $2,501.01-$5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - TERRY A HERSCHBERGER
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - TERRY A HERSCHBERGER | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - TERRY A HERSCHBERGER | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/20/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021049869 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS- PROPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.