Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cresanto, Brian, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Page, James, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BONNER, KIMBERLY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBONNER, KIMBERLY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2021106369 | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION -RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021216757) | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: HEARING - CIVIL DATE: Dec 2 2021 9:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FORM A | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - FL RESIDENCY - BRIAN CRESANTO - ISSUE DATE 05/22/2017 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.