Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Walkiewicz, Alba, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Walkiewicz, Hubert, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with HUNT, REBECCA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHUNT, REBECCA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution South County 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - ON JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT AND MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION -JOINT TO AMENDED FINAL JUSGMENT AND MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2022048505 | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION -RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022086083) | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES - DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE - OF COMPLETION - HUBERT WALKIEWICZ - NOTICE OF FILING | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.