Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Palmieri, Joshua, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Cole, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with CURLEY, ROCHELLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCURLEY, ROCHELLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity/Disestab 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023137061) | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 08/31/2023 AT 11:30 AM IN 5A , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Aug 11 2022 1:30PM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT - SETTING | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 2 2022 3:00PM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.