Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rossi, Kristina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aleksandr Garnyk, Alexander, Garnyk, Garnyk, Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2022049072 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION -RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022087881) | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE - SUPPORT | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER - JURISDICTIONAL DEFECTS IN WIFE'S PETITION AND AGREEMENT TO FLORIDA COURT ASSUMING JURISDICTION OVER DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE PROCEEDING | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SETTING TRIAL SUPPORT - NON JURY | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 20 2022 9:00AM JUDGE: HUNT, REBECCA LOCATION: JACS | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - ADOPTING AND APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER - FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.