Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rariden, Danielle, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Zittrer, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BONNER, KIMBERLY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBONNER, KIMBERLY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity/Disestab 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023137060) | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 08/31/2023 AT 11:30 AM IN 5A , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT - PATERNITY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 27 2022 1:30PM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.