Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Carey, Barry Lee filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryFormal - Probate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022054150) | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING - PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF CLAIM - AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - INVENTORY | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | INVENTORY - NO FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.