Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Carver, Carla J, Carver, Davis B, filed a(n) Other Civil - Non-Monetary - County (South County) case represented by Nohren, Alyssa, against All Other Unknown Parties In Possession, Unknown Party In Possession 1, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with GALEN, PHYLLIS R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Non-Monetary - County (South County) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Davis B. Carver and Carla J. Carver, husband and wife, against an unknown party in possession and all other unknown parties in possession. The complaint is for unlawful detention of real property in Sarasota County, Florida...
PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2021076338
Date: September 07, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION
Date: November 18, 2021SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION, 501 PAMETO ROAD NOKOMIS FL 34275
Date: October 14, 2021MAIL RETURNE - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSESSION
Date: October 25, 2022DEFAULT - PROPOSED
Date: November 18, 2021SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1- ISSUED 09/17/2021
Date: September 07, 2021ANSWER - JULIANNA SHERWOOD AND JAKE MCCAULEY
Date: October 15, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 23, 2022MAIL RETURNED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION 1
Date: October 25, 2022DEFAULT - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: October 18, 2022COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNE - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSESSION | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION 1 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 12/16/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN ZOOM , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - PROPOSED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 - ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER - JULIANNA SHERWOOD AND JAKE MCCAULEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.