Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Saratoga Place Apartments Property Owner Llc, filed a(n) Evictions Residential Non-Monetary case represented by Barron, James Ivy Iii, against Palo, Alfonse, Palo, Mary Jane, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryEvictions Residential Non-Monetary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY JANE PALO - ISSUED - 9/9/2021
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: March 25, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - MARY JANE PALO | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - ALFONSE PALO | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - ALFONSE PALO - MARY JANE PALO | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY JANE PALO - ISSUED - 9/9/2021 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2021075303 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALFONSO PALO - ISSUED - 9/9/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.