Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Contract And Indebtedness - $8,001 To $15,000 (South County) case represented by Zogg, Erik, against Long Iii, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness - $8,001 To $15,000 (South County) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)
Date: September 01, 2021SUMMONS NON SERVED - JOSEPH LONG III
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: May 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - JOSEPH LONG III | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021075191 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY) | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-JOSEPH LONG III - ISSUED - 9/7/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.