Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Villagewalk Of Sarasota Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gugino, Joseph, Teuber, Steven, against Bilicki, Dilfa, Bilicki, Edward J, Unknown Tenants, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with DENKIN, DAVID LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDENKIN, DAVID LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Foreclosure $8,001 To $15,000 (South County) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COMPLAINT - COUNTY
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DILFA BILICKI - ISSUED 06/14/2021
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS NON SERVED - EDWARD J BILICKI
Date: June 23, 2021LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021108995)
Date: June 10, 2021MOTION - FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 10, 2021SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANTS
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION
Date: July 02, 2021SUMMONS SERVED - DILFA BILICKI
Date: June 23, 2021ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - LUTHERAN SERVICES FLORIDA INC
Date: July 02, 2021PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2021050317
Date: June 10, 2021PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021051644
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR. / 2021143530) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN TENANT(S) - Recorded (OR. / 2021124539) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - LUTHERAN SERVICES FLORIDA INC | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - EDWARD J BILICKI | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANTS | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - DILFA BILICKI | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021051644 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.