Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Thumbage, Chandasiri, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Socha, Alicia, against Ritacco, James Paul, represented by Haskell, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with CARROLL, HUNTER W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARROLL, HUNTER W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit 2010 |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 12th Judicial Circuit in Sarasota County, Florida. The plaintiff, Chandasiri Thumbage, is suing the defendant, James Paul Ritacco, for damages in excess of $30,000. Chandasiri Thumbage is an individ...
NOTICE - SERVICE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT AND PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT PURSUANT
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE - SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 11, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - CANCEL ALL HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL DATES - CANCEL ANY PENDING FORECLOSURE SALE - DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORTS | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCHARGING SHOW CAUSE ORDER | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE - SETTLEMENT | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE - SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.