Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rashid, Mehwish, filed a(n) case against Olsen, Jonathan N, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with MCHUGH, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCHUGH, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2021APPLICATION INDIGENCY DENIED
Date: June 09, 2021ORDER - SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021214681) | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/12/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 7A , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION INDIGENCY DENIED | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.