Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ally Financial Inc, filed a(n) case represented by Solis, Yulexy, against Holland, Brittany M, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BOEHM, MARYANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOEHM, MARYANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Ally Financial Inc. (formerly known as GMAC) against Brittany M. Holland. The jurisdiction of this action falls within the limits of the county court in Sarasota County, Florida. The defendant can be served at the address l...
COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY) - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: April 16, 2018VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: May 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - BRITTANY M HOLLAND | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018039982 | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY) - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BRITTANY M HOLLAND - ISSUED 04/17/2018 | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.