Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Archer, Richard Francis, filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with Donna Padar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Padar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016133617) | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ACTION: FORWARDED ORDER TO THE COURT | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED- AUDITED | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - CANCELLED CHECKS H LEE MOFFITT CANCER CENTER, AIS RECOVERY SOLUTIONS LLC | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.