Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with David L. Denkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Denkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Discover Bank against Amy L. Funderburk in the County Court of Sarasota County, Florida. Discover Bank is a FDIC-insured Delaware State Bank. The complaint alleges two counts: breach of contract and account stated.
In the...
JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016061046)
Date: May 17, 2016MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY
Date: October 03, 2016COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)
Date: October 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED - SERVED - WELLS FARGO BANK N A | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHEE | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE ATTORNEY FEE DEMAND | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED- WELLS FARGO BANK NA MAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2016101010 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT PROPOSED | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016061046) | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.