Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gallagher Jr, Owen P filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with ECONOMOU, DENO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeECONOMOU, DENO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING LIMITED INCAPACITY FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2014127445) | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUTE NUMBER - 744.331 | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT OF EXAMINING COMMITTEE - TRACEY BOURNE | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT OF EXAMINING COMMITTEE - TRACEY BOURNE | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT OF EXAMINING COMMITTEE - ROBERT LUFKIN | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT OF EXAMINING COMMITTEE - JAMES R BOONE PHD | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: HEARING - CIVIL DATE: Oct 23 2014 2:00PM JUDGE: ECONOMOU, DENO LOCATION: JACS | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: HEARING - CIVIL DATE: Oct 23 2014 2:00PM JUDGE: ECONOMOU, DENO LOCATION: JACS | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE BY ELISOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.