Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) case represented by Ross, Vanessa, against Haley, Sandra, Haley, Warren, Millennium Insurance And Investment Group Of Florida, Inc., represented by Bentley, Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BAILEY, DEBORAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAILEY, DEBORAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2001 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is a notice of service of an offer of judgment/proposal for settlement as to Count III of the Third Amended Complaint. The plaintiff in this case is UPC Property & Casualty Insurance Company, and the defendants are Warren Haley and San...
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED AND RECORDED
Date: June 20, 2016PETITION- FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2013SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WARREN HALEY - ISSUED
Date: October 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED AND RECORDED | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CROSS-NOTICED HEARING | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF BETSY HERLIHY, CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST MILLENNIUM INSURANCE AND INVESTMENT GROUP OF FLORIDA, INC. | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | CROSS-NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 31 2016 10:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.