Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reynolds, Connie Irene, filed a(n) case against Reynolds, Wrightman Scott, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with PADAR, DONNA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePADAR, DONNA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016009257) | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED- WRIGHTMAN SCOTT REYNOLDS | |
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 01/26/2016 AT 11:30 AM IN J , JDG: BERLIN, DONNA PADAR | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE - PRO SE - CONNIE REYNOLDS | |
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - FAMILY SENT ON: 03/19/2013 12:36:32 | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FORM A | |
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - FAMILY SENT ON: 10/09/2012 13:00:06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.