Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campellone, Angela, filed a(n) case against Amador, Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with KRUG, THOMAS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKRUG, THOMAS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - GRANTING STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ACTION:REOPEN CLOSED PURSUANT TO AO 2017-6.2 | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - JOINT TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | *** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 12 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Dec 12 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: KRUG, THOMAS LOCATION: JACS | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION - APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.