Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Luepkes, Thomas, filed a(n) case represented by Arcaro, Riccardo, against Busch, Treba Sue, represented by Parker, Dale, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with DIVISION A, CIRCUIT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDIVISION A, CIRCUIT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 04, 2012FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED (STIPULATION ATTACHED)
Date: May 17, 2012NOTICE OF FILING-ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 12, 2012REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DOCUMENTS TO TREBA SUE BUSCH
Date: December 01, 2011DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY
Date: February 01, 2012RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 18, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED (STIPULATION ATTACHED) | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | COPIES - CIRCUIT RECEIPT: 738480 DATE: 04/13/2012 | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE - DEFENDANTS ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNEDROBIN LYNNE STEVENSON-SUBSERVED ALEX STEVENSON-SPOUSE | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED UNSERVED ROBYN LYNNE STEVENSON | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT TREBA SUE BUSCH'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.