Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barrera, Wilson, filed a(n) case represented by Turffs, Robert, against Kruger, Christine, represented by Wyckoff, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2010 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED
Date: January 21, 2011NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 15, 2011RESPONSE- LETTER WITH WRITTEN RESPONSE
Date: October 21, 2010MOTION TO DISMISS - KRUGER, CHRISTINE
Date: October 27, 2010MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: May 03, 2011MOTION-DISMISS -CHRISTINE KRUEGER ATTORNEY: WYCKOFF, MICHAEL DAVID (0978477)
Date: November 01, 2010NOTICE-SERVING REQUEST
Date: February 16, 2011ORDER - GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: June 17, 2011ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015140045)
Date: November 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - CHRISTINE KRUGER | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - WILSON BARRERA | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015140045) | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 11/10/2015 AT 11:00 AM IN 2B , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER - GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE (COPY) (RECEIVED FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE) ATTORNEY: WYCKOFF, MICHAEL DAVID (0978477) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.