Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) case represented by Rosaler, Brian, against All Other Unknown Parties, Castor, Jean R, Citimortgage Inc, Joseph, Roseline, Unknown Tenant In Possession #1, (total of 6) See All represented by Heintz, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2010 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, as the trustee for the certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-13, against Jean R. Castor, Roseline Joseph, Citimortgage Inc., and unkn...
MOTION TO STAY PENDING VERIFICATION OF DEBT
Date: October 13, 2010ANSWER - JEAN CASTOR; ROSELINE JOSEPH
Date: July 11, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 28, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014116763) | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2014106842 | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2014106841 | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | BID SHEET | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2014104917 | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR SALE SCHEDULED 09/19/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.