Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with Maria Ruhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria Ruhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED MODIFYING CHILD SUPPORT - Recorded (OR. / 2019020702) | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - JOINT STIPULATION (NO IMAGE) | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO MODIFIY CHILD SUPPORT | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION- OF HEARING | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | *** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Nov 20 2018 10:00AM JUDGE: DEMEDIO, GLORIA LOCATION: JACS | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER (REQUIRING CLERK ACTION) | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Nov 20 2018 10:00AM JUDGE: DEMEDIO, GLORIA LOCATION: JACS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.