Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brannon, William D filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with ECONOMOU, DENO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeECONOMOU, DENO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014046011) | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | PHONE CONVERSATION RECORD | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER-PROPOSED | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING - PROBATE | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.