Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tilsley, David L, filed a(n) case represented by Kurvin, Stephen Henry, against Mccall, Debby, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED
Date: October 02, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED - DEBBY MCCALL | |
October 10, 2009 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: 10/09/2009 TIME: 9:00 AM JUDGE: GALEN, PHYLLIS R LOCATION: COURTROOM 7-B | |
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL SENT ON: 10/09/2009 09:23:10 | |
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED - DEBBY MCCALL HANDED TO ATTORNEY | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DEPOSIT | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | ACTION: - FWD RQST TO JUDGE | |
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - DEBBY MCCALL - POSTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.