Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bass & Associates Inc A Florida Corporation, filed a(n) case represented by Watts, Dana, against Wyckoff, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED
Date: February 06, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - MICHAEL WYCKOFF | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE-TAKING DEPOSITION | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED-MICHAEL WYCKOFF | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - MICHAEL WYCKOFF - SERVED | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - COSTS | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE- MICHAEL WYCKOFF | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER-DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.