Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harnas, Ilona, filed a(n) case against Gardner, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED
Date: November 24, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - ADAM GARDNER | |
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event | WRITOF POSSESSION ISSUED- HANDED TO PET | |
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | ACTION: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT FWD TO JUDGE | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE-ADAM GARDNER | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION RECEIPT: 470994 DATE: 11/10/2008 | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ADAM GARDNER HANDED TO PET RECEIPT: 470994 DATE: 11/10/2008 | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION SENT ON: 11/10/2008 11:24:45 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.