Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aloha Mobile Home Park, filed a(n) case represented by Nohren, Alyssa, against All Unknown Occupants, Munachino, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with COUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOUNTY CIVIL DIVISION 1 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED
Date: October 17, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED - JOSEPH MUNACHINO | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FORWARDED TO SSO | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED | |
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ACTION: MOTION AND FJ FWD TO JUDGE | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT | |
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - JOSEPH MUNACHINO | |
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS | |
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED- JOSEPH MUNACHINO HANDED TO PS | |
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION SENT ON: 09/24/2007 16:49:45 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.