Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Justice, June E, filed a(n) case against Justice, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with FAMILY 2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFAMILY 2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION FOR CONTEMPT/ENFORCE | |
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - FAMILY SENT ON: 08/03/2007 14:35:39 | |
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING COURT DATE | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION - FOR CONTINUANCE | |
July 17, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING COURT DATE | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - JEFFREY JUSTICE | |
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY ISSUED | |
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST-FORM A | |
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - FAMILY SENT ON: 11/28/2006 12:01:50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.