Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lese, Dennis, filed a(n) case against Toale, Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BOEHM, MARYANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOEHM, MARYANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
ANSWER AND DEFENSES
Date: October 25, 2005MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 17, 2005MOTION TO QUASH
Date: August 10, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - DENNIS LESE | |
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - DENNIS LESE | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF NO CASE ACTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING SENT ON: 09/29/2011 13:13:16 | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION SENT ON: 09/29/2011 13:14:17 | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: LACK OF PROSECUTION DATE: 12/06/2011 TIME: 1:30 PM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: COURTROOM 7-B | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE - WITH 2005 CA 12115 NC | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | DOCKETED IN ERROR - X'S ON 2005 CA 12115 | |
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.