Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Siesta Dunes Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) case represented by Summonte, Joseph Frank Jr, against Gezelman, Allen D, The Home Service Store, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with DIVISION A, CIRCUIT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDIVISION A, CIRCUIT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Siesta Dunes Condominium Association, Inc. against Allen D. Gezelman, doing business as The Home Service Store. Siesta Dunes Condominium Association is a not-for-profit corporation responsible for the operation of Siesta Du...
ANSWER
Date: October 21, 2005ANSWER - AMENDED
Date: November 14, 2005ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: November 29, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE | |
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE-CASE UNDER CHAPTER 7 | |
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION - TIME | |
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION - FOR TIME | |
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING TRIAL | |
November 29, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT | |
November 22, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event | ANSWER - AMENDED | |
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - ALLEN D. GEZELMAN DBA THE HOME SERVICE STORE | |
October 21, 2005 | Docket Event | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.