Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Societ, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Deluca, Annalise Hayes, against Avalon Estates Association, In, Greiner, Michelle Lyn, Greiner, Unknown Spouse Of Mic, Pugh, Bradly Ryan, Pugh, Unknown Spouse Of Bradly, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County, FL, . Santa Rosa County, FL Superior Courts with DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Rosa County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 22, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: September 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AVALON ESTATES ASSOCIATION 10-3-22
Date: October 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - FORECLOSURE | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR PARTY NOT REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY (FORM 2.602) MICHELLE AND RYAN | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT MICHELLE AND BRADLEY | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRADLY PUGH | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHELLE LYN GREINER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.