Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Herrington, Cathy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Herrington, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County, FL, . Santa Rosa County, FL Superior Courts with MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Rosa County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Update Event UNCONTESTED on 5/5/2021 1130 AM Judge MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE results 5/10/2021 on DISPOSED | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT SCHEDULED ON 5/5/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL VIA ZOOM SCHEDULED FOR 5-5-2021 @ 11:30 AM | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE: MAGISTRATE , MICHELLE INERE ASSIGNED | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE 572021DR000062DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/14/2021 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $397.50 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $427.00 BALANCE REMAINING $427.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.