Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Fuller, Charity, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fuller, Charles Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County, FL, . Santa Rosa County, FL Superior Courts with MICHELLE INERE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHELLE INERE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Rosa County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Update Event UNCONTESTED on 5/12/2021 1100 AM Judge MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE results 5/12/2021 on DISPOSED | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Update Event UNCONTESTED on 4/28/2021 1100 AM Judge MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE results 3/16/2021 on CONTINUED | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT SCHEDULED ON 5/12/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL , AMENDED, VIA ZOOM SCHEDULED FOR 5-12-2021 @ 11:00 AM | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT SCHEDULED ON 4/28/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL 04/28/2021 @11AM | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT TO WAIVE FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE BOTH SIGNATURES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.