Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bain, Holly Lyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Snyder, Charlotte Ruth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County, FL, . Santa Rosa County, FL Superior Courts with MICHELLE INERE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHELLE INERE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Rosa County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT OF GENERA; MAGISTRATE | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MAGISTRATE AND RECOMMENDED | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Update Event SIMPLIFIED on 2/8/2021 0130 PM Judge MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE results 2/8/2021 on DISPOSED | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | EVENT SCHEDULED ON 2/8/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FEBRUARY 8, 2021 @1:30 PM ZOOM | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE: MAGISTRATE , MICHELLE INERE ASSIGNED | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE 572021DR000016DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/5/2021 | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS - CHARLOTTE RUTH SNYDER | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $397.50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.