Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Davies, June Annie, Estate Of Trevor Davies, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case represented by Briggs, Laurie J, Gustafson, James, Warriner, C Calvin, against Liggett Group Llc, Lorillard Tobacco Company, Philip Morris-Usa Inc, R J Reynolds Tobacco Company, Vector Group Ltd Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Cruz-Alvarez, Frank, Dyer, Karen C, Parker, Stephanie E, Reichert, Paul Rudolph, Sexton, Terrence James, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MAKEMSON, ROBERT R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMAKEMSON, ROBERT R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2009 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
|
ANSWER- VECTOR GROUP
Date: March 30, 2012REPLY TO AFFIR' DEFENSES - PHILLIP MORRIS ( V )
Date: September 01, 2009REPLY TO AFFIR' DEFENSES - LORILLARD INC ( V )
Date: September 01, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 05/12/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN M/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MAKEMSON, ROBERT R | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - AMENDED | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.