Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Collins, George Rene, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with MAKEMSON, ROBERT R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMAKEMSON, ROBERT R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 1999 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE PLACED WITH LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP IN FILE SlcLGBSPlacements_11112021.txt - BALANCE DUE $710.00. | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 07/28/2021 - FAILED TO PAY $710.00 | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 07/28/2021 | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 07/26/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN M/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | HISTORICAL CASE DOCUMENTS (UNINDEXED) | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney PAUL ROBERTSON AMOS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT RECEIVED - COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL RET REL 1/23/01 | |
February 05, 2001 | Docket Event | VIOLATION OF PROBATION - SENTENCE CHARGES/COSTS/FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.