Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Thomas, M, in the jurisdiction of St. Johns County, FL, . St. Johns County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2020 |
CategoryBusiness Transaction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Johns County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 |
HEARING (CIVIL)
Judge: SMITH, R. LEE |
||
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY: SPARROW, JIMMIE III ASSIGNED TO PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL COURT NOTES | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE LETTER DATED JULY 2, 2020 | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO: PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS; SPARROW, JIMMIE III REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CA20-0513, PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC VS. THOMAS, M WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: W150-7/2/2020 | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - JULY 2, 2020 AT 10:30AM | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020012930 | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.