Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Acosta, Haylan, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with BOATWRIGHT, JOE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOATWRIGHT, JOE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship 25-E |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED on 9/14/2022 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | GUARDIANSHIP COURT MINUTES | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING -SEPTEMBER 13, 2022 AT 1:30 PM | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTE FROM CLERK: ZOOM INFORMATION SENT FROM JUDGES OFFICE 9/13/2022 AT 1:30 PM | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $400.00 FORMAL GUARDIANSHIP | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2022010770 | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OF MINOR CHILD | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.