Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nowicki, Kristopher M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nowicki, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with WASHINGTON, ALICIA R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWASHINGTON, ALICIA R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE SENT TO VITAL STATISTICS ON DIVORCE | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED on 11/15/2022 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT MINUTES | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE- KRIS NOWICKI | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF RESIDENCY | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERENCE | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING COURSE - HEATHER NOWICKI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.