Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services L, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Vanslette, Jason Michael, against First Coast Community Credit U, Flaherty, Brian, Flaherty, Unknown Spouse Of Br, Tenant 1, Unknown, Tenant 2, Unknown, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANESK, KENNETH JAMES II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 19, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $22.50 Receipt Number MX 2023006605 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED on 5/1/2023 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 3 - TOTAL $22.50 ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS OVER 5 - CA | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 - PROPERTY VACANT | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DANA BLACK AS LOAN MANAGER FOR FIRST COAST COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION 03-16-2023 | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - PROPERTY VACANT | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: - 06-08-2023 9:00 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.