Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Beeks X Inc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Hoover, Myles Alexander, against Tarpon Iv Llc, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANESK, KENNETH JAMES II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 16, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED RAF O 9/27/2022
Date: September 29, 2022COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED on 10/28/2022 | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE AFTER DEFAULT | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FOR CLERK TO ISSUE | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED RAF O 9/27/2022 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $419.00 Receipt Number MX 2022011234 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JONATHAN R. POLITANO, REGISTERED AGENT OF TARPON IV, LLC | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 - TOTAL $419.00 ISSUE SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.