Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Hall, Forrest Allen, United States Of America Actin, Unk Spouse Of Forrest Allen Ha, represented by Rudy, John Forney, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with CHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTENSEN, PATTI ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: November 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK #200031 $100,100.00 | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED on 8/17/2020 | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FOR CLERK TO ISSUE (PROPOSED) | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS FOR CLERK TO ISSUE (PROPOSED) | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSMENTS | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Compliance Issue Cert Title has been created |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.