Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Posojewitsch, Johannes, Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., filed a(n) Othot - Other General Civil case represented by Smith Brendan P, against Posojewitsch, Johannes, Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., represented by Wikgren Brent, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 BRANDON J RAFOOL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 BRANDON J RAFOOL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryOthot - Other General Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
PETITION FOR APPEAL AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED FOR A SUBPOENA JAMES ELLIOT | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER VOLKSWAGEN GOURP OF AMERICA INCS OBJECTIONS TO RESPODENT/COUNTER PLAINTIFFS | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT/COUNTER PLAINTIFFS (AMENDED) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF/PETITIONERS CORPORATE | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT/COUNTER PLAINTIFFS WITNESS LIST | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT/ COUNTER PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION-VIRTUAL | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/30/2024 09:00 AM | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 07/10/2023 01:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.