Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Agosto, Paul, Amendola, Melissa, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Keegan Mark G, against Tower Hill Select Insurance Company Nka Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 BRANDON J RAFOOL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 BRANDON J RAFOOL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 107th Judicial Circuit in and for Polk County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Melissa Amendola and Paul Agosto, are suing the defendant, Tower Hill Select Insurance Company, for damages in excess of $30,0...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DOCUMENTS REPONSIVE | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION AND NOTICE TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 06/19/2023 10:45 AM | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT TOWER HILL SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT OR IN THE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.