Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Neilson Enterprises Inc Dba Orlando Roofing Aao Mo, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Heil David R, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Katz Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 BRANDON J RAFOOL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 BRANDON J RAFOOL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Neilson Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Orlando Roofing on behalf of Moise Soumbey-Alley against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The complaint alleges that Citizens Property Insurance Corporation has refused to fully pay f...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | EXPERT INTERROGATORIES AND NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXPERT PRODUCTION | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL VIOLATION OF FRCP 1.370 | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.