Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grady Judd, As Sheriff Of Polk County, Florida, filed a(n) Forf - Forfeiture case against Three Thousand Six Hundred Eleven And 00 100, Trotman, Maurice, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryForf - Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/7b341a4c-9db5-4494-b8d4-593b153414d2/Doc DEFEULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND FINALORDER OF FORFEITURE / FDEFAULT |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/7b341a4c-9db5-4494-b8d4-593b153414d2/Doc FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/0a812f44-43bf-4e2a-ab6b-e7aff5cedc0a/Doc MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OF FOREITURE |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;22127;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/214fc1bf-cf9e-41b8-8429-23a6d8e95461/Doc CLERKS DEFAULT/ MAURICE TROTMAN |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/ae1155b6-7076-4f8a-86a5-009aa7e6e995/Doc AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/9bb115ec-5271-4170-bf5d-25e70be28782/Doc DEFAULT (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK) |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/9bb115ec-5271-4170-bf5d-25e70be28782/Doc MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/a91cc61b-3107-4421-ad80-e101ba8e2fc1/results/467f7722-99ba-492f-badf-4887bb6e414f/lines/35a0d204-dee2-4a56-8b86-ab36b9309ce9/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - MAURICE TROTMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.