Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Miller Devora, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lopez Anthony M, against Security First Insurance Company, represented by Fisher Keller F, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 GERALD P HILL II presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 GERALD P HILL II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 26, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER- CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL TRACK | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 10/19/2021 01:30 PM | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 10/19/2021 01:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.